judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLE (WYATT) VS. MINERAL COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

Case Information: 47929
Short Caption:COLE (WYATT) VS. MINERAL COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47968 , 47971
Lower Court Case(s):Mineral Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PC2057Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus & Order to Show Cause. 06-17850
09/20/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-19327
09/21/2006Other Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 08/28/06 addressed to Wyatt Cole remailed to corrected address.
10/17/2006RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 06-20882
10/17/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/02/2006Other Returned Mail. Notice in Lieu of Remittitur addressed to Wyatt Cole returned. No forwarding address.