judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE, WELFARE VS. LEA

Case Information: 46002
Short Caption:STATE, WELFARE VS. LEACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - R125900Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/04/2005 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/26/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19107
10/04/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/12/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-20199
11/01/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-21547
11/08/2005MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 05-22031
12/05/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 05-23683
12/05/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.