judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SEELEY VS. STAR INSURANCE CO.

Case Information: 46008
Short Caption:SEELEY VS. STAR INSURANCE CO.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50741
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A455921Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/04/2005 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Steven J. Parsons--check no. 7153.
09/27/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19147
10/04/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/05/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 05-19732
10/13/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-20299
12/01/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 11, 2006. 05-23582
02/08/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-02856
02/16/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 06-03496
03/06/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 06-04882
03/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing shall be suspended pending further order of this court. 06-05619
04/19/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-08183
05/16/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-08288
05/16/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2006. 06-08288