judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4802
B-4802
07/31/1974
Application for Writ of Error
THEODORE STANLEY GORDON
RALPH CURTON, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/27/1974Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/14/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/09/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/09/1974Response to Motion filed
11/27/1974Brief in Support of Petition
11/18/1974Response to Motion filed
11/14/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/13/1974Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
08/09/1974Response to Petition
07/31/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/31/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ralph Curton, Jr.Respondent
Theodore Stanley GordonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information