judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7752
A-7752
03/03/1960
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN J. STAUFFER, JR.
CITY OF SAN ANTONIO, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/16/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/28/1960Supplement to ResponsePetitioner
06/09/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/22/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/18/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
03/03/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/20/1961Response to Motion filed
03/16/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/01/1961Opinion issued
10/05/1960Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1960Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1960Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1960Document received (See Remarks)
09/28/1960Supplement to Response
06/09/1960Motion for RehearingFiling granted
03/22/1960Reply to Response
03/18/1960Response to Petition
03/03/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/03/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John J. Stauffer, Jr.Petitioner
City of San Antonio, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information