judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00603-CR
14-89-00603-CR
06/28/1989
Other Felony
Larson, Christine Ilene
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/08/1991Case stored
04/05/1991Mandate Issued
04/05/1991Mandate Issued
03/21/1991No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
01/24/1991Extend time to file PDR DISPOSEDGRANTED
01/04/1991No motion for rehearing FILED
12/20/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/20/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/19/1990Submitted
12/19/1990Submission
12/19/1990Submitted
06/29/1990No description available.
02/22/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/22/1990Case ready to be set
02/22/1990Case ready to be set
02/08/1990Order Entered
01/29/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/04/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/27/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/30/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/22/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/24/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/23/1989Transcript FILED
07/26/1989Motion for new trial FILED
06/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/26/1989Date of Sentence
06/26/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/08/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasLinda A. West
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantDouglas M. O'Brien
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
493,850
10 years TDC/$5,000 fine