judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIPTON (DUANE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42100
Short Caption:TIPTON (DUANE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41838 , 72647 , 72647-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C175456Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Agosti for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/25/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. 10/17/03 ORDER: TRANSERRED TO DOCKET NO. 41838.
09/25/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 10/17/03 ORDER: TRANSERRED TO DOCKET NO. 41838. 03-16092
09/26/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. 10/17/03 ORDER: TRANSERRED TO DOCKET NO. 41838.
10/17/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order to Administratively Close Docket. Administratively Closing Appeal (No. 42100). On July 25, 2003, appellant filed a notice of appeal. The appeal was docketed in this court in Docket No. 41838. Because the district court had not yet entered a written order denying the petition, this court directed the district court to enter a written order denying the petition or inform this court that it was reconsidering its decision. The district court entered a written order denying the petition on September 9, 2003. On September 22, 2003, appellant filed a notice of appeal from the September 9, 2003 order, and this notice of appeal was docketed in this court in docket No. 42100. Two separate cases were inadvertently opened in this court under Docket Nos. 41838 and 42100. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to " . . . administratively close Docket No. 42100." The clerk of this court shall transfer to Docket No. 41838 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 42100. Appellant's appeal from the denial of his petition will proceed under Docket No. 41838. This order does not affect that portion of this court's August 19, 2003 order filed in docket No. 41838 directing the clerk of the district court to transmit the trial court record within 120 days. Nos. 41838/42100 cases are not consolidated. 03-17334
10/17/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. Administratively closed. No remittitur issued.