judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 42125

Case Information: 42123
Short Caption:CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 42125Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:42123*, 42125 Related Case(s): 46012 , 46683 , 47885 , 50487 , 53486 , 53656
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030888Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/02/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-16438
10/08/2003MotionFiled Stipulation. (to consolidate case nos. 42123 and 42125) 03-16770
10/22/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. Order Approving Stipulation. On October 8, 2003, the parties filed a stipulation to consolidate these appeals. Cause appearing, the stipulation is approved, and these appeals are hereby consolidated for all appellate purposes. Nos. 42123/42125 03-17535
11/06/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Nos. 42123/42125. 03-18531
11/06/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. Nos. 42123/42125. 03-18532
11/26/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 42123/42125. (03-19769) 03-19769
02/25/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM. Nos. 42123/42125. 04-03628
03/23/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-03652
03/23/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 24, 2004. 04-03652