judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEP'T OF TAXATION VS. DAIMLERCHRYSLER SERVICES

Case Information: 42117
Short Caption:DEP'T OF TAXATION VS. DAIMLERCHRYSLER SERVICESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0300007AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:10/20/2003 / King, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:02/16/2005 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/16/2005How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/02/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16397
10/14/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 26, 2003. To Court Reporter: C. Wolden. 03-17018
10/14/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-17019
10/20/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/24/2003Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Patrick O. King. Settlement Judge requests that this matter be exempted from the settlement conference program. 03-19533
12/10/2003Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. On November 24, 2003, the settlement judge submitted a letter to the clerk of this court recommending that this appeal be removed from the settlement conference program. We elect to treat that letter as a settlement conference report, and direct the clerk to file that letter. Pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 03-20554
12/10/2003Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Letter from Settlement Judge Patrick O. King. Settlement Judge requests that this matter be exempted from the settlement conference program. 03-19533
01/09/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/26/03. Court Reporter: Corrie L. Wolden. 04-00597
04/05/2004AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 8. 04-06257
04/07/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-06380
05/06/2004MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 05/26/04. 04-08375
05/27/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-09776
06/23/2004MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 23, 2004. 04-11468
07/20/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-13177
08/20/2004BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. 04-15115
09/13/2004BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Respondents. 04-16730
09/14/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Respondent's Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities. 04-16862
12/20/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on February 16, 2005, at 9:00 a.m. (En Banc)
01/25/2005BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Appellant's Second Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities. 05-01599
01/31/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
02/16/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court.
05/05/2005MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion to file a Third Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities. 05-08900
06/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed May 5, 2005. We will consider the supplemental authority attached to appellant's motion in our resolution of this matter. Respondent may respond by filing a supplemental memorandum pursuant to NRAP 31(d) within 5 days from the date of this order. 05-12988
07/07/2005MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion to File a Fourth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities. 05-13485
07/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed July 7, 2005. We will consider the fourth supplemental authority attached to appellant's motion in our resolution of this matter. Respondent may respond by filing a supplemental memorandum pursuant to NRAP 31(d) within 5 days from the date of this order. 05-14632
09/15/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Rose, J. We concur: Becker, C.J., Gibbons, Douglas and Parraguire, JJ. Maupin, J., dissenting. Hardesty, J., dissenting. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 56. EN BANC. 05-18285
10/11/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-18425
10/11/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/18/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 12, 2005. 05-18425
11/15/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. To the Publishers from Cay Jordan, Editor. Correction on page 5 (line 2 and 10) of Justice Hardesty's dissent of the original opinion filed September 15, 2005.