judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BORGER VS. DIST. CT. (LOVETT)

Case Information: 42128
Short Caption:BORGER VS. DIST. CT. (LOVETT)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A460906Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/14/2004 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:09/14/2004How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/03/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from John L. Hilts & Associates, Ltd.--check no. 7219.
10/03/2003Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-16472
10/03/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days
10/13/2003Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. 03-16932
11/10/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 03-18771
11/17/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Notice of Change of Address. 03-19078
12/11/2003Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. (Real Parties in Interest James V. Lovett, M.D., F.A.C.S., Individually; Lewis & Lovett, Ltd., D/B/A Desert West Surgery). 03-20609
12/11/2003AppendixFiled Appendix. Real Parties in Interest (James V. Lovett, M.D., F.A.C.S., Individually; Lewis & Lovett, Ltd., D/B/A Desert West Surgery) Appendix of Document to the Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-20610
12/18/2003Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)), "Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus."
12/23/2003MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Permission to file a Reply Brief. 03-21343
01/28/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Firm of Record. Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP, now represents real parties in interest James Lovett, Lewis & Lovett, & Desert West Surgery. 04-01857
03/23/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file Reply in Support of Petition for a Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petitioner shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a reply to the real parties in interest's answer. 04-05481
03/29/2004Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. 04-05771
07/26/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on September 14, 2004, at 11:00 a.m. (SNP04D - RR/WM/MD)
08/27/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
09/02/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Leslie H. Wolf associates as co-counsel for petitioner. 04-16016
09/14/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP04D-RR/WM/MD
12/29/2004Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus. Before Rose, Maupin and Douglas, JJ. Author: Maupin, J. We concur: Rose and Douglas, JJ. . 120 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 102. SNP04D 04-23604
12/29/2004WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to John L. Hilts for service upon Judge Saitta. 04-23608
01/18/2005WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Nancy M. Saitta on January 7, 2005. 04-23608
01/25/2005RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 05-00923
01/25/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/31/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Publishers from Cay Jordan, Editor. Correction on page 14 of the original opinion filed December 29, 2004.