judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KING (JASON) VS. DIVISION OF PAROLE & PROBATION

Case Information: 42127
Short Caption:KING (JASON) VS. DIVISION OF PAROLE & PROBATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C179495Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/02/2003Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-16452
10/15/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. fn3[The clerk of this court shall amend the caption on this court's docket sheet to correspond to the caption on this order.] 03-17092
11/13/2003Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 03-18959
11/25/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP04-DA/RR/WM 03-19704
12/09/2003Other Returned Mail. Order filed 11/25/03 addressed to Jason King returned. No forwarding address.
12/23/2003RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 03-19745
12/23/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.