judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LO (AMY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42111
Short Caption:LO (AMY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48553
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C190921Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/30/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-16299
11/26/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's counsel Benson Lee shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 03-19759
12/16/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-20917
12/30/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 16, 2003. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on December 16, 2003. 03-21664
12/30/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-20918
12/30/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-20919
12/31/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-21698
12/31/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 03-21700
03/23/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-05452
04/20/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-06570
04/20/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/13/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 22, 2004. 04-06570