judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEETER VS. YOUNKER

Case Information: 42104
Short Caption:DEETER VS. YOUNKERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0202496Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/10/2003 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Sourwine & Sloane, Ltd.--check no. 9086.
09/26/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16123
10/06/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 on cross-appeal from Del Hardy Esq.--check no. 6792.
10/06/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 03-16635
10/10/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/13/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16973
10/14/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Robert Eisenberg. (docketing statement)
10/16/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-17203
10/20/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Robert Eisenberg. (docketing statement)
10/20/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.
11/19/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 03-19278
12/03/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. The parties shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal and cross-appeal, or otherwise inform this court of the status of this matter. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal and cross-appeal as abandoned. 03-20066
12/18/2003Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 03-21066
01/07/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP-TH 04-00312
01/07/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.