judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARVEY (DANIEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46045
Short Caption:HARVEY (DANIEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47404
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 04CR0037Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/03/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/03/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-19625
10/06/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 06/16/04 and 06/17/04. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. Not filed in district court. 05-19842
10/19/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 06/16/04 and 06/17/04. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 05-20767
11/02/2005MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Oversized Fast Track Statement. 05-21579
11/10/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the 22-page fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on November 2, 2005. 05-22154
11/10/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-21580
11/10/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volumes 1 and 2. 05-21581
11/22/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-23071
11/22/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 05-23072
03/14/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-05498
05/01/2006Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[We have received and considered appellant's proper person documents.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-09151
05/26/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-09543
05/26/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 31, 2006. 06-09543