judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GEARY VS. DESERT PALACE

Case Information: 46041
Short Caption:GEARY VS. DESERT PALACECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44221
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A478812Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/07/2005 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Seegmiller & Associates--check no. 4133.
09/30/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19505
10/07/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:William F. Buchanan . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/25/2005Other Returned Mail. Receipt for documents (with/docketing statement) dated 09/30/05 and Notice of Settlement issued 10/07/05 addressed to Seegmiller & Associates remailed to corrected address.
11/09/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-22071
11/17/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-22687
11/18/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Royal, Jones, Dunkely, & Wilson. 05-22791
12/12/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 1/19/06. 05-24199
01/04/2006Other Returned Mail. Set. Conf. Status Report filed 12/12/05 addressed to Royal Jones Dunkley & Wilson remailed to corrected address.
01/25/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-01849
01/30/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 06-02145
02/21/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/08/05. To Court Reporter: Norma Silverman. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 06-03740
03/02/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 06-04715
03/13/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 8, 2005. Court Reporter: Norma Jean Silverman. 06-05407
05/03/2006MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Voluntary Dismissal. 06-09251
05/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 06-10889
05/24/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.