judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADLI VS. STUHFF

Case Information: 42142
Short Caption:ADLI VS. STUHFFCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44144
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A461621Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-16662
10/07/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/17/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Paricher G. Adli -check no. 0467.
10/17/2003Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Forwarded check no. 250613062 to the Clark County District Court in the amount of $250.00 for payment of the cost bond.
10/23/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. As appellant's notice of appeal was filed before the district court entered a formal written order, it is ineffective and fails to vest jurisdiction in this court. We therefore ' . . . dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction.' NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-17713
11/18/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-18094
11/18/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2003. 03-18094