judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WELLS (DELWYN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42067
Short Caption:WELLS (DELWYN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41714 , 42011 , 42039 , 42046 , 47767 , 48884 , 51957 , 55607 , 65651 , 69629 , 69629-COA , 73884 , 73884-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189058Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/22/2004How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15701
10/03/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16478
10/03/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 23, 24, and 25, 2003. To Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 03-16479
10/16/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 06/23/03, 06/24/03, and 06/25/03. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 03-17264
01/16/2004MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 17, 2004. 04-01004
02/18/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-03087
02/20/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed February 18, 2004. Appellant shall have until March 15, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 04-03275
03/16/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-04960
03/18/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed March 16, 2004. Appellant shall have until March 25, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 04-05106
03/29/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-05865
03/29/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 04-05866
04/28/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-07814
06/11/2004Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
06/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 04-11359
06/22/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/26/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-15432
09/21/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-15839
09/21/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 23, 2004. 04-15839