judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HADLEY (RYAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44010
Short Caption:HADLEY (RYAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35328 , 37067 , 38784
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982001Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/28/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/28/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-17970
09/30/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 7/27/04. Court Reporter: Marcia Ferrell. 04-18118
10/28/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-19945
10/28/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-19946
11/18/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-21313
01/31/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-01910
02/25/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-02174
02/25/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 1, 2005. 05-02174