judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00255-CR
01-82-00255-CR
04/15/1982
Other Felony
Sewell, Clyde Wade
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/12/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/12/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/13/1984Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
03/21/1984No description available.Refused
11/14/1983No description available.
09/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/17/1983Submitted
08/17/1983Submission
08/17/1983Submitted
08/10/1983Reset submission date
08/10/1983Submission
06/30/1983Submission
05/17/1983Brief filed
05/12/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/02/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/31/1983Brief filed
03/31/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/23/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/06/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/28/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/29/1982Record filed
04/15/1982Notice of appeal filed
04/15/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/12/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information