judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-82-00054-CV
10-82-00054-CV
04/17/1982
Miscellaneous civil
R.W. Tamplen, Trustee
Arlie Bryeans and Robert J. Wilson, Trustee
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/2001Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/16/1983Case stored
02/16/1983Mandate issued by this Court
09/23/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
09/02/1982Submitted
04/16/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/13/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
18th District Court
Johnson
267-80