judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00529-CR
05-82-00529-CR
04/28/1982
Burglary of Vehicles
Richard Orbra Perry
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/2017Order enteredDestroy
03/28/2017Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
11/07/1983Mandate Issued
09/09/1983Order issuedWithdrawn
09/08/1983Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
08/05/1983Submission
07/28/1983Brief Filed
07/28/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/27/1983MattConv
12/16/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/15/1982Brief Filed
09/30/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/29/1982Order Atty. to File Brief Disposed
08/18/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
06/03/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/28/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Perry, Richard OrbraCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
296th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Collin District Judge, 296th District Court
F81-052-MH
3 yrs & 1 day TDC