judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-82-00066-CV
10-82-00066-CV
04/30/1982
Miscellaneous civil
E.R. Woodward
William Higdon
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/2001Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/15/1983Case stored
06/15/1983Mandate issued by this Court
11/04/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/14/1982Submitted
04/30/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/13/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
74th District Court
McLennan
79-2835-3