judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEANE VS. DIST. CT. (ROGER)

Case Information: 47957
Short Caption:DEANE VS. DIST. CT. (ROGER)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48145
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A526648Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/30/2006MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal Proceedings pending Outcome of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Filed via fax.) 06-18061
08/30/2006Other Other. Filed Exhibit to Motion for Stay (Opposition and Motion to Dismiss, Selective Prosecution, Denial of Equal Protection and Motion to Consolidate Actions, Motion to Stay Proceedings filed in the district court on 8/28/06). Filed via fax. 06-18075
08/31/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Certificate of Facsimile Transmission. 06-18076
08/31/2006Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (Filed via fax) 06-18077
08/31/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition of Respondent David Roger, District Attorney, to Petitioner Frances Deane's Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal Proceedings Pending Outcome of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (filed via fax). 06-18113
09/01/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Original Copy of Opposition of Respondent David Roger, District Attorney, to Petitioner Frances Deane's Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal Proceedings Pending Outcome of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 06-18113
09/01/2006MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. of Respondent David Roger, District Attorney, to Petitioner Frances Deane's Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal Proceedings Pending Outcome of Petition for Writ of Mandamus Under NRAP 28 (c). Filed via fax. 06-18201
09/01/2006MotionReceived Reply to Response. of Respondent David Roger, District Attorney, to Petitioner Frances Deane's Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal Proceedings Pending Outcome of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Filed via fax. NOTE: (Order filed 10/18/06 denies motion to file reply. Reply was discarded per AH.) 06-18202
09/05/2006MotionFiled Motion. Motion for an Order for Expedited Transcript of Pre-Hearing Matters. (w/attached letter to court reporter). Filed via fax. 06-18244
09/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Due from Petitioner: 10 days. 06-18569
10/12/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from C. Conrad Claus--check no. 1419.
10/18/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. "We DISMISS this petition as moot." Fn3 [In light of this order, petitioner's motions for a stay, to file a reply to the motion's opposition, and for expedited transcripts are denied as moot.] NNP07-NB/JH/RP 06-21484
11/15/2006RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 06-22884
11/15/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.