judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF GAVIN

Case Information: 47954
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF GAVINCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P057948Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/06/2006 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/30/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-18031
08/30/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/05/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert J. Kossack, Esquire--check no. 1832.
09/05/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 06-18263
09/06/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/22/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Letter from Settlement Judge Howard Roitman recusing himself from this matter. Nos. 47953/47954-cases are not consolidated. 06-19507
09/26/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
10/06/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan.
10/10/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-20725
10/10/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 06-20727
10/16/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-21261
10/20/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-21675
10/23/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-21792
11/20/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 21, 2006. Nos. 47953/47954-cases are not consolidated. 06-23761
11/22/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 28, 2006. Nos. 47953/47954-cases are not consolidated. 06-24022
12/04/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 5, 2007. Nos. 47953/47954-cases are not consolidated. 06-24786
01/31/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 47953/47954-cases are not consolidated. 07-02491
01/31/2007Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Nos. 47953/47954-cases are not consolidated. 07-02492
01/31/2007Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. Nos. 47953/47954-cases are not consolidated. 07-02493
02/06/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 07-03041
02/06/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.