judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FULLERTON VS. STATE (CIVIL)

Case Information: 44077
Short Caption:FULLERTON VS. STATE (CIVIL)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33416 , 33562 , 35189 , 43988
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV915979Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/29/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
10/14/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Corrine F. Bennett--U.S. Bank Money Order #411241868.
10/14/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-19041
10/19/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. CV915979: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 04-19296
02/15/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 17. 05-02991
02/15/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/17/2005MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Appellants' Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief and for Extension of Time (First Request). 08/29/05 Order: filed proper person document.jcr 05-03242
02/28/2005MotionReceived Response to Motion. Zipnut Technology, LLC.'s Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief and for Extension of Time. 05-03923
02/28/2005MotionReceived Motion. The State of Nevada's Joinder to Zipnut Technology, LLC's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief and for Extension of Time. 08/29/05 Order: filed document.jcr 05-03925
06/30/2005BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. 08/29/05 Order: filed proper person document.jcr 05-13000
06/30/2005MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Expedite Appeal. 08/29/05 Order: filed proper person document.jcr 05-13063
06/30/2005MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Appellants' Motion for Judicial Notice of Adjudiciative Facts. 08/29/05 Order: filed proper person document.jcr 05-13064
07/18/2005MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Zipnut Technology, LLC.'s Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. 05-14307
07/20/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Appellee State of Nevada's Joinder to Zipnut Technology, LLC's Motion to Strike. 05-14429
08/29/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants have moved this court for leave to file proper person documents under NRAP 46(b), to expedite the appeal, and for judicial notice of adjudicative facts. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to file appellants' February 17 2005, and June 30, 2005 motions, and respondents' February 28, 2005 opposition and motion. We grant the February 28, 2005 motion for joinder.] Respondents oppose appellants' motions and move this court to strike all of appellants' proper person motions. We grant appellants' NRAP 46(b) motion for the limited purpose of filing briefs and direct the clerk of this court to file the opening brief and appendices provisionally received in this court on June 30, 2005. To the extent that appellants seek an expedited briefing schedule, we grant the motion. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief and appendix. In lieu of an appendix, respondents may cite to the record on appeal. Appellants may file and serve any reply brief within 15 days from the date that the answering brief is served. No extensions of time to this briefing schedule will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Appellants ask this court to take judicial notice of articles of merger recorded with the Nevada Secretary of State on March 12, 1996. As the Secretary of State's records cannot reasonably be questioned with respect to their accuracy, we grant appellants' motion for judicial notice. fn4[In light of this order, we deny as moot appellants' request for an extension of time to file an opening brief. The Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment entered on July 14, 2005.] 05-17087
08/29/2005MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellants' Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief and for Extension of Time (First Request). 05-03242
08/29/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Zipnut Technology, LLC.'s Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief and for Extension of Time. 08/29/05 Order: filed document.jcr 05-03923
08/29/2005MotionFiled Motion. The State of Nevada's Joinder to Zipnut Technology, LLC's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief and for Extension of Time. 05-03925
08/29/2005MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellants' Motion to Expedite Appeal. 05-13063
08/29/2005MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellants' Motion for Judicial Notice of Adjudiciative Facts. 05-13064
08/29/2005BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. 05-13000
08/29/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief, Volumes 1 and 2. 05-13001
09/27/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-19178
09/27/2005MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal of Corrine Bennett; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. 05-19180
09/27/2005MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike New Issues on Appeal; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. 05-19181
10/03/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. 05-19543
10/03/2005BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. 05-19544
01/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal and Denying Motion to Strike. We grant respondents' motion and partially dismiss the appeal as to the October 7, 2004 notice of appeal, and we direct the clerk to modify the caption on this court's docket to reflect that Bennett is not an appellant. Although we deny the motion to strike, to the extent that certain issues are not properly before this court, they will not be considered in the context of our review of this appeal. We strike Bennett's name as an appellant from the briefs, and any issues raised by her in the briefs shall not be considered in resolving this appeal. 06-00430
05/01/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On January 9, 2006, this court dismissed this appeal as to appellant Corrine F. Bennett. Thereafter, this court received a document from Ms. Bennett to reconsider the order partially dismissing appeal as to Corrine F. Bennett. fn1[We have considered the proper person documents from Ms. Bennett.] We deny Ms. Bennett's motion to reconsider our January 9, 2006. 06-09099
06/29/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 06-13435
06/29/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06-MD/NB/RP
09/29/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-20082
10/25/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-20984
10/25/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/08/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2006. 06-20984