judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8358
B-8358
03/30/1979
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
CYNTHIA BURR
HON. FREDERICK SHANNON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/12/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/23/1979Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
05/23/1979Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
05/23/1979Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
05/15/1979Motion for RehearingRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/29/1980Order from Lower Court filed
01/23/1980Opinion issued
07/12/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/13/1979Miscellaneous Motion
06/12/1979Notice of Appearance
05/23/1979Exhibits in case/cause filed
05/23/1979Brief in Support of Petition
05/23/1979Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
05/15/1979Motion for RehearingFiling granted
04/23/1979Response to Motion filed
03/30/1979Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. Frederick ShannonRespondent
Texas Shorthand Reporters AssociationAmicus Curiae
Cynthia BurrRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information