judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCGUIRE (THOMAS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44059
Short Caption:MCGUIRE (THOMAS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43242 , 47586
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C114430Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-18664
11/17/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-21081
12/14/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-21252
12/14/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/27/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 16, 2004. 04-21252