judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RITENOUR (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44075
Short Caption:RITENOUR (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/13/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/13/2004Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Extraordinary Writ (Motion to Dismiss). 04-19014
11/17/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-21082
12/14/2004RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 04-21247
12/14/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/15/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On November 17, 2004, this court entered an order denying petitioner's proper person petition for extraordinary relief. On November 22, 2004, this court received a proper person motion seeking the appointment of counsel. In light of this court's order denying the petition, the motion is hereby denied as moot. 04-22840