judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRYANT VS. BRYANT (CHILD CUSTODY)

Case Information: 47909
Short Caption:BRYANT VS. BRYANT (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38339 , 39931 , 42789
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D211327Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2006 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ensign Federal Credit Union--cashiers check no. 4485027135.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17604
08/24/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/01/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/25/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
10/02/2006MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay of the District Court's Order Pursuant to NRAP 8(d); Motion for an Extension of Time to file Required Documents due to Extreme and Unforeseen Circumstances; and for Leave to file a Reply. 06-20141
10/03/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the case appeal statement and docketing statement. fn1[We waive the requirement that the case appeal statement be filed in the district court.] Because issuance of the clerk's notice scheduling this appeal for a settlement conference suspended the time for filing a request for transcripts, we deny appellant's motion to the extent it seeks an extension for filing such request. We defer ruling on appellant's motion to stay the district court's July 24, 2006, order until the time for the filing of an opposition has expired. 06-20222
10/04/2006Other Returned Mail. Notice to File Docketing Statement issued on 09/25/06 addressed to Attorney Michael Warhola remailed to corrected address.
10/05/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-20472
10/09/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Defendant's Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay of the District Court's Order Pursuant to NRAP 8(d). 06-20598
10/16/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-21234
10/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 06-21235
10/18/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for Stay. We deny appellant's motion. 06-21393
10/25/2006Other Other. Filed Respondent's Response to Case Appeal Statement. 06-21886
10/25/2006Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 06-21887
10/25/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. on settlement judge. Due date: 10 days.
10/31/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Respondent's Response to Case Appeal Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-22211
10/31/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Respondent's Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. 06-22224
11/22/2006Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appellant's Supplement Affidavit, Supplemental Exhibits, Proof of Service, and Emergency Writ of Petition for Extraordinary Relief. Nos. 44434/47909-cases are not consolidated. Clerk7 12/14/06 Order: proper person document stricken.jcr 06-24292
12/11/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. 06-25304
12/14/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Striking "Appellant's Supplement Affidavit, Supplemental Exhibits, Proof of Service and Emergency Writ Petition for Extraordinary Relief" (No. 47909). On October 18, 2006, we denied appellant's motion for stay. Appellant's supplement also asks for emergency writ relief. A review of the supplement reveals that this portion of the supplement is directed to our deny appellant's motion for stay. Appellant is represented by counsel. His proper person submission is thus improper. We strike the supplement. fn5[Appellant's counsel may file a motion for reconsideration of our order deny a stay, and if necessary, for an extension of time to do so.] Nos. 44434/47909 cases are not consolidated. 06-25562
01/03/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-00169
01/03/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Expedited Filing Deadlines. Courtesy notice only. Order reinstating briefing will follow.
01/17/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing fast track statement and response. Appellant: 10 days to request transcripts by filing a request form in the district court and filing 2 file-stamped copies of that request form with this court; 40 days to file and serve the fast track statement. Respondent: 20 days from service of appellant's fast track statement to file and serve the fast track response. 07-01208
01/29/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 04/12/05, 04/19/05, 08/15/05, 09/28/05, 10/06/05, 1/04/06, 03/27/06, and 05/30/06. Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. Filed in district court on: 01/26/07. 07-02181
03/12/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-05732
03/15/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Documents for Briefing. 07-06025
03/20/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 04/12/05, 04/19/05, 08/15/05, 09/28/05, 10/06/05, 1/04/06, 03/27/06 and 05/30/06. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 07-06313
04/09/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for Ninety-Day Extension of Time. Appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix by April 27, 2007. Respondent may file a fast track response within 20 days from the date the fast track statement is served. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-07886
04/11/2007MotionFiled Motion. Supplement to Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Fuile the Attached Fast Track Statement and Appendix. 07-08094
04/18/2007MotionFiled Motion. to Withdraw Appellant's Supplement to Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File the Attached Fast Track Statement and Appendix as Moot. 07-08701
04/30/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 07-09566
04/30/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 through 3. 07-09567
05/11/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy for transcripts. 07-10525
05/18/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 07-11008
05/18/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Receipt of Copy (Fast Track Statement and Appendix). 07-11038
05/29/2007MotionFiled Motion. for Leave to File Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Child Custody Fast Track Response in Lieu of Seeking Leave for Full Briefing. 07-11768
06/04/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion Leave toFile Appellant's Reply in Lieu of Seeking Leave for Full Briefing. 07-12126
06/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order in its entirety." fn6[We deny appellant's motion for leave to file a reply. We grant appellant's April 18, 2007 motion to withdraw his April 11, 2007 motion.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-12580
06/15/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. from Michael Warhola - $100 from Michael Warhola - money order no. 10624396680. The fee for a rehearing is $150.00. An additional $50.00 is still due.
06/15/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. of this Court's June 8, 2007 Order of Affirmance. 07-13130
06/25/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $50.00 from Mark Bryant - check no. 0088671458.
10/02/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP07-RP/JH/NS. 07-21748
10/15/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 07-22758
10/30/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-22187
10/30/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/En Banc Reconsideration Pending.
10/31/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC 07-23938
11/09/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 1, 2007. 07-22187
11/20/2007Post-Judgment PetitionReceived Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing of Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. -RETURNED, UNFILED, PER 01/24/08 ORDER. 07-25229
11/20/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Michael Warhola-M.O.#11730607727.
01/24/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This petition is procedurally improper. Accordingly, we will take no action on the petition. The clerk shall return to appellant the petition, unfiled, and the filing fee received on November 19, 2007. 08-01893
01/24/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Michael J. Warhola returning Petition and informing him that a refund of the filing fee has been requested. (Copy to AOC) 08-01899