judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GENERAL STEEL DOMESTIC SALES VS. WARD

Case Information: 47900
Short Caption:GENERAL STEEL DOMESTIC SALES VS. WARDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0402046Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2006 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jonathan J. King--check no. 17041.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17569
09/01/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/15/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-19029
09/15/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-19088
11/01/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-22322
11/14/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-23261
11/16/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not limited to the district court's post-judgment order awarding attorney fees and costs. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellants' response is served. 06-23540
12/01/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-24592
12/15/2006MotionFiled Reply to Response. Respondents' Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-25673
01/05/2007MotionFiled Motion. (from attorney Jonathan H. King) 07-00327
01/09/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion. 07-00573
02/02/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. And Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Appellant. Having concluded that appellant's notice of appeal was untimely as to the judgment and the order denying the motion to compel arbitration, we dismiss this appeal in part. The appeal may proceed only as to the post-judgment order awarding attorney fees and costs. We will not take action on appellant's proper person submission asking that appellant be afforded time to retain substitute counsel and that the court return this matter to the settlement conference program. We grant Mr. King's motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. The clerk shall remove Mr. King as counsel for appellant. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to (1) obtain counsel or (2) inform this court in writing that it does not intend to obtain new counsel. Failure to obtain counsel or to otherwise respond to this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal. The time to request transcripts and for brief shall be suspended pending further order of this court. 07-02744
03/01/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Bob Eisenberg regarding a settlement of this appeal and a stipulation to dismiss. 07-05006
08/07/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER we DISMISS this appeal." NNP07-RP/JH/NS. 07-17327
08/10/2007Other Returned Mail. Order Dismissing Appeal, addressed to General Steel Domestic Sales, re-mailed to corrected address.
09/04/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-17438
09/04/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/11/2007Other Returned Mail. Remittitur addressed to General Steel Domestic Sales re-mailed to corrected address.
09/11/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 6, 2007. 07-17438