judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS VS. CHRISTENSEN LAW OFFICES

Case Information: 47903
Short Caption:WILLIAMS VS. CHRISTENSEN LAW OFFICESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45285
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A462073Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17578
08/24/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Amended. 06-17792
09/25/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts.
10/10/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-20731
10/10/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 06-20733
10/10/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert J. Kossack, Esq., check no. 1834.
11/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. 06-23196
12/04/2006MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Appellant's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal and Notice of Settlement. 06-24709
01/05/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. We grant the motion and " . . . dismiss this appeal." fn1[We express no opinion on the potential jurisdictional defect addressed in this court's November 13, 2006, order to show cause.] SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-00324
01/05/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.