judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH VS. SUNRISE HOSPITAL

Case Information: 44026
Short Caption:SMITH VS. SUNRISE HOSPITALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A416250Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Becker for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/06/2004 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/15/2005 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/15/2005How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Harrison Kemp & Jones, LLP--check no. 44203.
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18283
10/06/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/12/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-18919
10/21/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Hall, Prangle & Schoonveld, LLC has associated with Dennett & Winspear as counsel for respondent. 04-19497
10/22/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel. (Notice of Association of Counsel)
12/06/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 04-22202
12/08/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, L.L.C., d/b/a Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, hereby substitutes the law firm of Hall Prangle & Schoonveld, LLC in the place and stead of law firm of Dennett & Winspear. 04-22359
12/15/2004Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 04-22850
12/15/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/03/04 (3), 05/04/04 (6), 05/05/04 (5), 05/06/04 (2), and 07/22/04. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 04-22880
01/26/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/03/04; 05/04/04; 05/05/04 (morning session); 05/05/04 (afternoon session); 05/06/04 (morning session); and 05/06/04 (afternoon session). Court Reporters Jenness Powers and Diann Prock. 05-01710
03/28/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcript. Ms. Silvaggio and Ms. Orduna shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the July 22, 2004 transcript. If more time is need, Ms. Silvaggio or Ms. Orduna shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time. If the transcript cannot be produced, Ms. Silvaggio or Ms. Orduna shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 05-06037
04/04/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-06603
04/04/2005AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 05-06604
04/04/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice to Court Regarding Joint Appendix. 05-06606
05/02/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-08539
06/02/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-10875
07/19/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcript. In the interest of judicial economy, we waive the requirement that the parties' joint appendix only include copies of transcripts that were filed in the district court prior to the docketing of this appeal. Because the July 22, 2004, transcript is included in the joint appendix, we conclude that Ms. Orduna and Ms. Silvaggio are no longer obligated to file a certified copy of it with this court. 05-14342
10/12/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 15, 2005, at 1:30 p.m. (NNP06R-MD/RR/RP)
11/01/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
11/15/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Parraguirre. Law firm of Harrison Kemp & Jones, LLP.
11/15/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06R-NB/MD/RR
12/20/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06R-NB/MD/RR 05-24797
01/17/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-00487
01/17/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2006. 06-00487