judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BASS VS. THE DOCTORS' COMPANY

Case Information: 44027
Short Caption:BASS VS. THE DOCTORS' COMPANYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44584 , 45002 , 52313
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A373226Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/12/2004 / Osko, EugeneSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
10/04/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18304
10/04/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/04/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/12/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eugene Osko. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/03/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 04-20247
12/07/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from David L. Phillips & Assoc., Lawyers--check no. 4133. (Also received two checks for district court filing fee and cost bond on appeal which were forwarded to the Clark County Clerk.)
12/07/2004MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw Interlocutory Appeal. 04-22275
01/28/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on December 7, 2004, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 05-01833
01/28/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.