Case: 06-17-00151-CR
06-17-00151-CR
07/31/2017
Poss or Promotion of Child Pornography
Carlos Omar Casillas aka Carlos Omar Casillas Padilla
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/12/2017 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/04/2018 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
11/09/2017 | Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant | | |||||||
11/08/2017 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
11/03/2017 | Submitted | | |||||||
10/13/2017 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||||
10/13/2017 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
10/13/2017 | Letter filed | | |||||||
10/12/2017 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||||
09/25/2017 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed | | |||||||
09/12/2017 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed | | |||||||
08/10/2017 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
07/31/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/04/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored |
01/04/2043 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Clay Harrison William W. Ramsay |
Casillas, Carlos Omar | Criminal - Appellant | Jason Niehaus |
Trial Court Information
8th District Court
Hopkins
Honorable Eddie Northcutt
1725962
Jana Atchison Rushing
10 YRS TDCJ-ID