judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5075
B-5075
02/10/1975
Application for Writ of Error
STEVE G. BEEVER, ET AL.
HON. W. SALE LEWIS, SAVINGS AND LOAN COMMISSIONER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/07/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/18/1975Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/21/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
02/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/15/1975Response to Motion filed
05/07/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/18/1975Reply to Response
02/21/1975Response to Petition
02/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/10/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. W. Sale Lewis, Savings and Loan Commissioner, et al.Respondent
Steve G. Beever, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information