Case: 14-20-00514-CV
14-20-00514-CV
07/21/2020
Mandamus
In re Kuraray America, Inc.
Yes
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/21/2020 | Original Proceeding response filed | Real party in interest |
| ||||
07/21/2020 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/02/2020 | Case stored | | |||||
09/02/2020 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
09/02/2020 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
08/18/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||
08/18/2020 | Motion to dismiss disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
08/18/2020 | Motion for temporary relief disposed | DENIED AS MOOT | | ||||
08/17/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
08/17/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
08/10/2020 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
08/10/2020 | Response due | | |||||
08/05/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
07/22/2020 | Letter filed |
| |||||
07/21/2020 | Original Proceeding response filed |
| |||||
07/21/2020 | Record filed |
| |||||
07/21/2020 | Record filed |
| |||||
07/21/2020 | Record filed |
| |||||
07/21/2020 | Motion for temporary relief filed |
| |||||
07/21/2020 | Record filed |
| |||||
07/21/2020 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/02/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
09/02/2026 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Roberto Alvarado, Marco Arroyo, et al | Real party in interest | Muhammad Suleiman Aziz Bernardino Agosto Jr. |
Jose Fuentes, Roberto Pineda, et al | Real party in interest | Andrew Cobos |
Albert Ybarra, Joseph Chapa, et al | Real party in interest | Brent Wayne Coon Robert Schwartz Matthew R. Willis |
Fernando Javier Aguilar, Juan Carlos Arredondo, et al | Real party in interest | Thomas F. Bickham David Brian Swick Don Ellis McClure Jr. |
Eduardo Rodriguez, Richard Edwards, et al | Real party in interest | Anthony Glenn Buzbee Christopher Leavitt Ryan Pigg |
Aron Alvarez, Alexander Anslem, et al | Real party in interest | Jay Todd Shields Dana Gareth Kirk Cristobal Miguel Galindo John A Daspit Robert Morse Kiernan McAlpine |
Richard Boullion, Jaime Balderas, et al | Real party in interest | John K Zaid |
Jesus Martinez, Roberto Carrazco, et al | Real party in interest | Norman Jolly Michael B. Jolly Hamilton Rucker Terry Bryant Gregg Anderson |
Jose Casas, Mirtha I. Gonzalez, et al | Real party in interest | Jose Orihuela |
Gabriel Tapia, Enrique Becerril, et al | Real party in interest | Michael E. Pierce Eduardo Garza III Kyle Chapel |
Luis Martinez, Alexander Rivera, et al | Real party in interest | W. Mark Lanier Lawrence P. Wilson Felicia Hubert |
Curtis Lummus, Andres Carvajal, et al | Real party in interest | Christopher Chad Pinkerton Benjamin Roberts Ryan Hamilton Zehl Kevin Haynes Matthew Martin |
Carnes, Jonathan | Real party in interest | Shane Pellerin |
Kuraray America, Inc. | Relator | Jeffrey S. Wolff Katherine D. Mackillop Peter C. Tipps |
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 333rd District Court
2018-62973