judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-96-00322-CR
09-96-00322-CR
10/22/1996
All Misdemeanors
Lacour, David
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/12/2000Case stored
09/12/2000Mandate Issued
06/28/2000Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/13/2000Submitted
05/18/2000Supplemental Brief Filed
05/18/2000Case ready to be set
04/28/2000Supplemental Brief Filed
03/31/2000Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/29/2000Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/15/2000Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/15/2000Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/10/2000Response
02/08/2000Response
02/01/2000Case remanded from higher court
02/01/2000Letter
02/01/2000Case Returned from Higher Ct.
02/01/2000Case remanded from higher court
01/31/2000Mandate Issued
01/05/2000Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/07/1999Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/06/1999Brief Filed
05/06/1999Letter
04/07/1999Petition for ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
04/07/1999Petition for ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
01/06/1999Petition for Review
12/22/1998Petition for ReviewFiled in Higher Court
12/18/1998Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/15/1998Petition for Review
12/03/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/02/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/18/1998Opinion issuedreversed and acquitted
11/18/1998Opinion issuedreversed and acquitted
11/18/1998Opinion issuedreversed and acquitted
05/13/1998Exhibits Filed
05/12/1998Order Entered
05/07/1998Submitted
05/07/1998Submission
03/27/1998Mt to reset oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/27/1998Submission
03/26/1998Mt to Reset Oral Argument Filed
02/11/1998Submission
02/05/1998Mt to reset oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/03/1998Mt to Reset Oral Argument Filed
12/16/1997Submission
08/13/1997Case ready to be set
08/13/1997Brief Filed
08/08/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/06/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/11/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/09/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/13/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/08/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/10/1997Brief Filed
01/08/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/08/1997Transcript Filed
01/07/1997Statement of Facts Received
10/22/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/22/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/12/2000Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lacour, DavidAppellantCarl A. Parker
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasRodney D. Conerly
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3
Jefferson
Honorable John Paul Davis
187999
$500 fine