judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00260-CR
05-82-00260-CR
03/01/1982
Aggravated Assault
Rickey Levester Shepherd
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/11/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/07/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/01/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
08/15/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/11/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
07/07/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/25/1982Clerks record filed
03/01/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/15/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Shepherd, Rickey LevesterCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 265th District Court
F81-11745-KR
Life