judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00030-CR
09-82-00030-CR
02/23/1982
Other Felony
Fruge, Allen J.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/26/1983Mandate Issued
12/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/26/1982Brief Filed
03/15/1982Brief Filed
02/23/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/26/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
39189
10 Years