judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-82-00029-CR
02-82-00029-CR
02/03/1982
Burglary
Williams, Frank E.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/18/1983Mandate Issued
11/02/1983Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals Reversed & Judg Trial Ct Affirmd
03/23/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCAMotion or Writ Granted
02/04/1983Response Filed
01/28/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
01/05/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/23/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Tarrant
18560
5 years