judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-82-00014-CR
10-82-00014-CR
02/04/1982
Theft Over $20,000
Elgin Royce Whitaker
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/1983Case stored
06/15/1983Mandate issued by this Court
12/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/09/1982Submitted
02/04/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/15/2083Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
81-464-C
Life