judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00024-CR
09-82-00024-CR
02/16/1982
Other Felony
Granger, Eugene
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/09/1982Mandate Issued
10/06/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/30/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/15/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/30/1982Brief Filed
05/28/1982Order Entered
02/16/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/09/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable John C Martin
35,222
10 Years