judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00117-CR
14-82-00117-CR
02/17/1982
Forgery
Breazeale, Thomas Ray
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/24/1985Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
07/16/1984Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/14/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewGRANTED
05/16/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
04/29/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
04/07/1983Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
02/24/1983Submitted
01/21/1983Submission
08/06/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/09/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
05/12/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
02/17/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
324,057
LIFE