judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-90-00585-CR
01-90-00585-CR
01/01/1970
Unknown Civil Case Type.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/17/1990Cause number voided--see remarks on history screenVoid this Court's case number
07/17/1990Cause number voided--see remarks on history screenVoid this Court's case number
07/02/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/29/1990Transcript filed
04/19/1990Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/17/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasRichard A. Dawson
StateCriminal - AppellantHon. Susan W. Burris
Trial Court Information