judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-90-00289-CV
01-90-00289-CV
01/01/1970
Unknown Civil Case Type.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/27/1990Filing fee paid
04/19/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
04/04/1990No description available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/04/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeBriarwest Apartments
StateAppellantDavid Shane Sommers
Trial Court Information