judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00141-CR
14-82-00141-CR
02/05/1982
Theft
Hogan, Mike
Texas, The State of
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/08/1983Mandate Issued
06/28/1983No description available.
06/09/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/29/1983Record Filed (Both records FILED)
02/05/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/08/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
310,374
60 days