judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-96-00238-CR
10-96-00238-CR
10/28/1996
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Mitchell Wayne Warnell
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/07/1998Case stored
04/07/1998Mandate issued by this Court
03/17/1998Case returned from higher court
02/11/1998Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
11/26/1997Case forwarded to higher court
11/21/1997Petition for Discretionary Review filed
10/22/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/17/1997Submitted
09/17/1997Submission
08/15/1997Submission
07/29/1997Brief filed, oral argument not requested
07/29/1997Case ready to be set
07/02/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/30/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
06/04/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/29/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
05/07/1997Brief filed, oral argument not requested
04/09/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/07/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
03/12/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/07/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
02/05/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/03/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
01/08/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/06/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
12/06/1996No Description Available.
12/06/1996No Description Available.
11/27/1996No Description Available.
10/28/1996Notice of Appeal filed
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/2023Case StoredDestroy case in 25 years.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Warnell, Mitchell WayneAppellantJoseph M. Layman
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasCindy V. Tisdale
Hon. Susan N. Kelly
John W. Segrest
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
Honorable George Allen
96-112-C
20 yrs TDC