judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-82-00011-CR
10-82-00011-CR
01/28/1982
Poss of a Firearm by Felon
Jerry Lynn Webb
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/07/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
03/21/1983Case stored
03/21/1983Mandate issued by this Court
09/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/09/1982Submitted
01/28/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
81-373-C
20 Years