Case: 01-24-00157-CV
01-24-00157-CV
02/26/2024
Divorce
Jaka Jakana
Rina Sefrin Hutagaol
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2024 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
02/28/2024 | Amended notice of appeal filed |
| |||||
02/26/2024 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
02/26/2024 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
02/23/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
02/19/2024 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/18/2024 | Status | Appellate court filing fee now due |
04/19/2024 | Status | Record due to be filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jakana, Jaka | Appellant | Benjamin Beveridge |
Hutagaol, Rina Sefrin | Appellee | Amy Carlin |
Trial Court Information
328th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable Judge 328th District Court
20-DCV-270246
Sylvia Thompson