judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1935
A-1935
11/04/1948
Application for Writ of Error
NARDIS SPORTSWEAR
JOHN J. SIMMONS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/25/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/17/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/17/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/28/1949Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/21/1949Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
02/14/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/09/1948Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/19/1948Response to PetitionRespondent
11/04/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/25/1949Reply to Response
03/22/1949Response to Motion filed
03/17/1949Response to Motion filed
03/17/1949Motion for Rehearing
03/17/1949Motion for Rehearing
02/28/1949Response to Brief filed
02/21/1949Brief on the Merits
02/14/1949Brief on the Merits
12/29/1948Motion to re-set submission date filed.
12/22/1948Document received (See Remarks)
12/09/1948Supplemental Brief filed
11/19/1948Response to Petition
11/04/1948Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nardis SportswearPetitioner
John J. SimmonsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information